Global Patent Index - EP 1018480 A3

EP 1018480 A3 2001-02-28 - Cable guide and drive machinery position for elevator

Title (en)

Cable guide and drive machinery position for elevator

Title (de)

Seilführung und Antriebsstelle für Aufzug

Title (fr)

Câblage et emplacement machinerie pour ascenseur

Publication

EP 1018480 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00100130 A

Priority

  • JP 264799 A
  • JP 23167399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1018480A2] There is described an elevator system which can be installed in a shaft accommodated within the height of the top floor of a building and in which a hoisting machine can be disposed within the shaft. A couple of turning pulleys for changing a main cable extending between a car and a counterweight from a vertical direction to a horizontal direction are provided in a space between the edge of the car and the interior wall surface of a shaft. A hoisting machine on which a drive sheave is provided in a rotatable manner such that the rotor axis of the drive sheave is oriented vertically is provided at the upper end of the shaft, such that the lower end of the hoisting machine is located at a position higher than the lower edges of the turning pulleys. As a result, the hoisting machine can be disposed in the shaft accommodated within the height of the top floor of a building, and the main cable can extend between the car and the hoisting machine. The elevator system can be installed within the shaft accommodated within the height of the top floor, thereby diminishing construction cost required for ensuring a space for installing the elevator system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 5/00 (2006.01); B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0202525 A1 19861126 - GEBAUER & CIE [CH]
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018480 A2 20000712; EP 1018480 A3 20010228; EP 1018480 B1 20040804; CN 1094887 C 20021127; CN 1260319 A 20000719; DE 60012588 D1 20040909; DE 60012588 T2 20050804; JP 2000255933 A 20000919; JP 4191331 B2 20081203; KR 100330286 B1 20020327; KR 20000052619 A 20000825

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 60012588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100208

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-21 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ERR

- Free Format Text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 05/30 PAGES: 234 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-10-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030327

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR NL

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI