Global Patent Index - EP 1018542 A1

EP 1018542 A1 2000-07-12 - Disinfecting detergents for hard surfaces

Title (en)

Disinfecting detergents for hard surfaces

Title (de)

Desinfizierende Reinigungsmittel für harte Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Détergents désinfectants pour surfaces dures

Publication

EP 1018542 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00108422 A

Priority

  • EP 95934068 A
  • US 31235494 A

Abstract (en)

Mixts. of (a) alk(en)yl glycosides of formula R<1>-O-(G)p (I), and (b) alkyl ethers of formula (II) are used to enhance the sterilising effects of detergents contg. disinfectants intended for use on hard surfaces. In the formulae R<1> = 8-22C alk(en)yl; R<2> = 8-18 (8-14)C aliphatic alk(en)yl; (G) = 5-6C glycose, pref. glucose; p = 1-10; x = 0-3 (pref. 0-2); and y = 1-15 (pref. 2.5-10). Also claimed are (i) aq. disinfectant detergents contg. 0.1-20 (pref. 0.2-10) wt.% (I: R<1> is 8-10C alk(en)yl), 0.05-20 (pref. 0.1-10) wt.% (II) and 0.01-5 (pref. 0.02-3) wt.% disinfectant (A), (B) or (C) (see below), all w.r.t. the detergent, and (ii) a method for the disinfecting and cleaning of hard surfaces using the detergent in undiluted or water-diluted form.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft die Verwendung einer Mischung aus Alkyl- bzw. Alkenyloligoglykosiden (APG's) und bestimmter C8-C18-Alkylether zur Verstärkung der keimreduzierenden Wirkung von desinfektionsmittelhaltigen Reinigungsmitteln für harte Oberflächen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/835; C11D 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/26 (2006.01); A01N 31/14 (2006.01); A01N 43/16 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/60 (2006.01); C11D 1/40 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/8355 (2013.01); C11D 1/40 (2013.01); C11D 1/528 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5856290 A 19990105; AT 215983 T 20020415; DE 59510159 D1 20020516; EP 0783560 A1 19970716; EP 0783560 B1 20020410; EP 1018542 A1 20000712; ES 2174961 T3 20021116; JP H10506143 A 19980616; PL 181663 B1 20010831; PL 318765 A1 19970707; US 5576284 A 19961119; WO 9610069 A1 19960404

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL-ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-07-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 783560

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE