Global Patent Index - EP 1018581 A1

EP 1018581 A1 2000-07-12 - Stair tread element

Title (en)

Stair tread element

Title (de)

Treppenstufenelement

Title (fr)

Elément de marche d'escalier

Publication

EP 1018581 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100245 A

Priority

EP 99100245 A

Abstract (en)

The steps have a horizontal step surface and a vertical front and rear outside surface. In side view the step has the shape of an inverted U with the two U-arms (7, 8) extending in the installed state of the step over the entire height (h) of the step. The two outside faces (3, 4) are formed as alternating visible surfaces with at least one having a projection (5, 6). the insides of the U arms in the installed state of the step run inclined upwards and inwards

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Treppenstufe mit einer im Einbauzustand im wesentlichen horizontalen Trittfläche und im Einbauzustand etwa vertikalen, in Stufenlängsrichtung verlaufenden vorderen und hinteren Aussenflächen beschrieben. Die Treppenstufe besitzt in der Seitenansicht etwa die Form eines umgedrehten U, wobei sich die beiden U-Schenkel im eingebauten Zustand der Stufe über die volle Stufenhöhe erstrecken. Beide Aussenflächen sind als voneinander abweichend ausgestaltete Sichtflächen ausgebildet, wobei mindestens eine Sichtfläche einen Vorsprung aufweist. Auf diese Weise wird eine Treppenstufe geschaffen, die sich durch eine einfache Handhabung, ein geringes Gewicht und eine große Vielseitigkeit auszeichnet und mit der auf besonders einfache Weise eine Treppe erstellt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/116

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/116 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/116 (2013.01); E04F 11/1041 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2461484 A1 19760708 - STEINMETZ U BAUSTOFF GMBH RADA

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018581 A1 20000712; EP 1018581 B1 20041124; AT 283405 T 20041215; DE 59911139 D1 20041230

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KOMBILITH G.M.B.H. ENTWICKLUNG UND VERWERTUNG

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KOMBILITH G.M.B.H. ENTWICKLUNG UND VERWERTUNG

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911139 P 20041230

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2004-11-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-06-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STAIR TREAD ELEMENT

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOMBILITH GMBH ENTWICKLUNG UND VERWERTUNG

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE NL

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI