Global Patent Index - EP 1018584 A1

EP 1018584 A1 2000-07-12 - Flue and flue block for realising such flue

Title (en)

Flue and flue block for realising such flue

Title (de)

Kamin und Kaminrohr zur Herstellung von Kaminen

Title (fr)

Conduit de cheminée ainsi que boisseau de cheminée utilisable pour réaliser un tel conduit

Publication

EP 1018584 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420002 A

Priority

FR 9900110 A

Abstract (en)

The flue duct is made from a series of parallelpiped hollow blocks (6), e.g. of extruded clay, with a main channel (10) and a horizontal pipe (18) connecting it to a furnace. The duct has a second channel (12) for drawing in the air for combustion through a gap (22) surrounding the horizontal pipe. The main channel can have a mineral wool surround for insulation.

Abstract (fr)

Ce conduit de cheminée comporte un passage sensiblement cylindrique destiné à l'évacuation de gaz brûlés et au moins un raccord, généralement perpendiculaire au passage (10), pour relier le passage (10) à une chaudière. Il comporte en outre un second passage (12), sensiblement parallèle au premier passage (10) et au moins un raccord (18) traverse le second passage (12). La paroi (16) du second passage (12), opposée au premier passage (10), présente une ouverture (20) dans laquelle passe le raccord (18) tout en laissant à la périphérie du raccord une lumière (22) mettant ainsi l'intérieur du second passage (12) en communication avec l'extérieur du conduit. L'invention concerne aussi des boisseaux de cheminée utilisés pour réaliser un tel conduit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 17/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018584 A1 20000712; FR 2788073 A1 20000707; FR 2788073 B1 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERYS TOITURE

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERYS TOITURE

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI