Global patent index - EP 1018596 A1

EP 1018596 A1 2000-07-12 - Method of modulating the power of a two-stroke internal combustion engine with a resonator connected to the crankcase

Title (en)

Method of modulating the power of a two-stroke internal combustion engine with a resonator connected to the crankcase

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Leistungssteuerung einer Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine mittels mit dem Kurbelgehäuse verbundenen Resonator

Title (fr)

Procédé de modulation de puissance d'un moteur à combustion interne à 2 temps par un résonateur relié au carterpompe

Publication

EP 1018596 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403283 A

Priority

FR 9900157 A

Abstract (en)

The power modulating procedure for a two-stroke engine with at least one cylinder (1) with an ingition plug (2), a piston (3), a crankcase pump (6) and a transfer duct (7), has a resonator chamber (14) connected to the crankcase pump via a channel (15). The channel has an electrically-, pneumatically-, or mechanically-controlled regulator (16) which is set according to the engine's operating mode or a parameter of that mode or the vehicle's speed.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un procédé de modulation de la puissance d'un moteur à combustion interne à 2 temps comprenant au moins un cylindre (1), un élément d'allumage (2), un piston (3) mobile en translation dans ledit cylindre et délimitant une chambre de combustion (5), un carter-pompe (6) séparé de la chambre de combustion (5) par le piston (3), au moins un conduit de transfert (7) entre le carter-pompe (6) et la chambre de combustion (5), au moins un conduit d'échappement (9), un orifice d'admission de gaz dans le carter-pompe (6), un moyen d'alimentation en carburant, une chambre additionnelle (14) reliée au carter-pompe (6) par un élément de liaison (15). Selon l'invention, la chambre additionnelle (14) ou résonateur présente un volume fixe et prédéterminé ; et le procédé consiste en outre à moduler l'ouverture de l'élément de liaison (15) par un moyen spécifique et en ce que ledit résonateur (14) est mis en communication avec le carter-pompe (6) au delà d'un certain régime du moteur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 25/14 (2006.01); F02B 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 25/14 (2013.01); F02B 33/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018596 A1 20000712; EP 1018596 B1 20050126; DE 69923422 D1 20050303; DE 69923422 T2 20050707; ES 2237061 T3 20050716; FR 2788309 A1 20000713; FR 2788309 B1 20010216

INPADOC legal status

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121224

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091225

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110316

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110329

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081230

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2237061

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69923422

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031107

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI