Global Patent Index - EP 1018623 A1

EP 1018623 A1 2000-07-12 - Flow distributor

Title (en)

Flow distributor

Title (de)

Strömungsverteiler

Title (fr)

Distributeur d'écoulement

Publication

EP 1018623 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99204617 A

Priority

NL 1010978 A

Abstract (en)

The flow distributor forms a separate unit comprising a pipe section(1) forming a first flow passage, a flow guide(4) connected to the first opening(2) of the pipe section to guide a portion of the flow through it, and a positioning device to position the flow distributed in the connecting opening so that the flow distributor protrudes into the guide system. With the flow distributor mounted in the connecting opening the pipe section interacts with the wall of the connecting opening.

Abstract (de)

Ein Strömungsverteiler, der dazu vorgesehen ist, in einem Leitungssystem angewandt zu werden, damit das Leitungssystem sich eignet, um zumindest während des Betriebes einen Durchfluß eines Ausdehnungsgefäßes, das über eine Anschlußöffnung an das Leitungssystem angeschlossen ist, zu bewirken, bildet eine separate Einheit, die umfaßt: ein Rohrteil (1), das einen ersten Durchflußkanal bildet, einen an eine erste Öffnung des Rohrteils anschließenden Strömungsleiter, um einen Teil der während des Betriebes auftretenden Strömung entlang des Strömungsleiters durch das Rohrteil zu leiten, und eine Positioniervorrichtung (5; 14), um den Strömungsverteiler in der Anschlußöffnung so zu positionieren, daß der Strömungsleiter in das Leitungssystem ragt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1041 (2013.01); F24D 3/1008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018623 A1 20000712; EP 1018623 B1 20031001; DE 59907187 D1 20031106; NL 1010978 C2 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907187 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020822

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI