Global Patent Index - EP 1018626 A3

EP 1018626 A3 2002-11-06 - Air conditioner regulating unit

Title (en)

Air conditioner regulating unit

Title (de)

Steuereinheit für Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Unité de commande d'un dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1018626 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00660002 A

Priority

FI 990015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1018626A2] The invention relates to an air conditioner regulating unit comprising a housing (1) to which air inlet and/outlet ducts (2, 3, 4, 5) are connected and which comprises an air flow regulating unit, such as a perforated plate (6, 7) having a shiftable throttle plate (8, 9) on its surface, the throttle plate being adjustable by means of an actuating mechanism (10) to regulate the air flow in the regulating unit. A presetting device (12) is provided between the throttle plate (8, 9) and the actuating mechanism (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/12; F16K 31/04; F16K 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018626 A2 20000712; EP 1018626 A3 20021106; EP 1018626 B1 20060823; DE 60030179 D1 20061005; DE 60030179 T2 20070606; FI 113397 B 20040415; FI 990015 A0 19990107; FI 990015 A 20000708; PL 196350 B1 20071231; PL 337683 A1 20000717

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60030179 P 20061005

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2003-12-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-10-29 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2003-10-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-08-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24F 13/12 A, 7F 16K 31/04 B, 7F 16K 37/00 B

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI