Global patent index - EP 1018629 A2

EP 1018629 A2 2000-07-12 - Hollow plate-like element

Title (en)

Hollow plate-like element

Title (de)

Plattenförmiger Hohlkörper

Title (fr)

Corps creux en forme de plaque

Publication

EP 1018629 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100021 A

Priority

DE 29900275 U

Abstract (en)

The hollow component comprises a flat wall plate (2) and at the connecting points has humps (4) pressed out from their planes and which by their top side are welded to the support plate (1). The humps have a flat top side parallel to the plane of the wall plate, and the humps are in the form of truncated cones. The wall plate is parallel to the support plate and correspondingly all the humps are of equal height.

Abstract (de)

Ein solcher Hohlkörper besteht aus einer ebenen Trägerplatte (1) aus Metall und aus einer dagegen dünneren, mit der Trägerplatte (1) deckungsgleichen Wandplatte (2) ebenfalls aus Metall. Die Wandplatte (2) ist randlich umlaufend sowie an mehreren oder vielen über die Plattenfläche verteilten Verbindungsstellen mit der Trägerplatte (1) verschweißt und unter Bildung eines zwischen den Verbindungsstellen durchgehenden, von einem Medium durchströmbaren Zwischenraums (3) in Abstand von der Trägerplatte (1) angeordnet. Ferner ist die Wandplatte (2) eben und hat an den Verbindungsstellen aus ihrer Ebene herausgedrückte Höcker (4), die mit ihrer Kopfseite (5) auf der Trägerplatte (1) aufgeschweißt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 3/12; F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01); F28F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/044 (2013.01); F28D 1/0308 (2013.01); F28F 3/12 (2013.01); F28F 2001/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900275 U1 19990401; EP 1018629 A2 20000712; EP 1018629 A3 20010207

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI