Global Patent Index - EP 1018629 A3

EP 1018629 A3 2001-02-07 - Hollow plate-like element

Title (en)

Hollow plate-like element

Title (de)

Plattenförmiger Hohlkörper

Title (fr)

Corps creux en forme de plaque

Publication

EP 1018629 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100021 A

Priority

DE 29900275 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1018629A2] The hollow component comprises a flat wall plate (2) and at the connecting points has humps (4) pressed out from their planes and which by their top side are welded to the support plate (1). The humps have a flat top side parallel to the plane of the wall plate, and the humps are in the form of truncated cones. The wall plate is parallel to the support plate and correspondingly all the humps are of equal height.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 3/12; F28D 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 3/04 (2006.01); F28F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 3/044 (2013.01); F28D 1/0308 (2013.01); F28F 3/12 (2013.01); F28F 2001/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900275 U1 19990401; EP 1018629 A2 20000712; EP 1018629 A3 20010207

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI