Global Patent Index - EP 1018710 A2

EP 1018710 A2 2000-07-12 - A device for checking the validity of banknotes and electronic card for use in this device

Title (en)

A device for checking the validity of banknotes and electronic card for use in this device

Title (de)

Geldscheinprüfvorrichtung und Chipkarte dafür

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'examen de billets de banque et carte à puce utilisée dans ce dispositif

Publication

EP 1018710 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830660 A

Priority

IT RM980254 U

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a device (1) for checking the authenticity of banknotes comprising a body (2) having a reading plane (4) and a cover (3), separated from each other by a gap (7) adapted to allow a banknotes to pass through it and having an inlet slot (8) and an outlet slot (9), said device also including an outwardly accessible socket for insertion of a data storage electronic card or chip-card (5), means (10, 10', 11, 11', 12, 12', 13, 13', 14, 14') for detecting and reading or scanning banknotes, mechanical means (16,22) for driving the banknotes inserted into the inlet slot (8), an electronic circuit for controlling said mechanical means (22) and for comparing the signals received from said detecting and reading means (12,12',13,13',14,14',15) to the data as stored in said electronic card (5) and means (19) to indicate the outcome of said comparison. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018710 A2 20000712; EP 1018710 A3 20020619; IT 245737 Y1 20020322; IT RM980254 U1 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050322

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041110

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARANNANTE, VINCENZO

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI