Global Patent Index - EP 1018716 A2

EP 1018716 A2 2000-07-12 - Emergency information system

Title (en)

Emergency information system

Title (de)

Notinformationsanlage

Title (fr)

Système pour information de secours

Publication

EP 1018716 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125149 A

Priority

DE 19858775 A

Abstract (en)

Illuminated display unit (5) of emergency information incorporates electro luminescent material, and is joined to a frequency generator (6) serving as an energy source.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt eine Notinformationsanlage mit wenigstens einem an einen Verstärker (3) angeschlossenen Notruflautsprecher (2) und mehreren Notleuchtdisplays (5), die als Leuchtmittel ein elektrolumineszierendes Leuchtmaterial (13) aufweisen, welche dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß mehrere Notleuchtdisplays an einen gemeinsamen Frequenzgenerator angeschlossen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 3/00 (2006.01); G09F 13/22 (2006.01); G09F 19/22 (2006.01); G08B 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 7/062 (2013.01); A62B 3/00 (2013.01); G09F 13/22 (2013.01); G09F 19/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858775 A1 20000629; EP 1018716 A2 20000712; EP 1018716 A3 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20011209

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08B 7/06 A, 7G 09F 13/22 B

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI