Global Patent Index - EP 1018716 A3

EP 1018716 A3 2000-11-08 - Emergency information system

Title (en)

Emergency information system

Title (de)

Notinformationsanlage

Title (fr)

Système pour information de secours

Publication

EP 1018716 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125149 A

Priority

DE 19858775 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1018716A2] Illuminated display unit (5) of emergency information incorporates electro luminescent material, and is joined to a frequency generator (6) serving as an energy source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 7/06; G09F 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 3/00 (2006.01); G09F 13/22 (2006.01); G09F 19/22 (2006.01); G08B 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 7/062 (2013.01); A62B 3/00 (2013.01); G09F 13/22 (2013.01); G09F 19/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858775 A1 20000629; EP 1018716 A2 20000712; EP 1018716 A3 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20011209

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08B 7/06 A, 7G 09F 13/22 B

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI