Global patent index - EP 1018720 A3

EP 1018720 A3 2000-11-29 - Display device for motion pictures

Title (en)

Display device for motion pictures

Title (de)

Präsentationseinrichtung für Bewegtbilder

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage pour images animées

Publication

EP 1018720 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124353 A

Priority

DE 29822097 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19958860A1] The presentation system has a free standing frame (6,8,10) and within this is a processor module (12) that graphics and video boards. At the top of the frame is a loudspeaker (22) and a touch screen (16) allows functions to be selected. A glass panel is used for advertising information (26). Output is generated to a screen projector (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 27/00; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/64 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/40 (2006.01); G09F 27/00 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822097 U1 19990415; DE 19958860 A1 20000615; EP 1018720 A2 20000712; EP 1018720 A3 20001129; JP 2000181385 A 20000630

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060131

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI