Global Patent Index - EP 1018727 A2

EP 1018727 A2 2000-07-12 - Recording method and recording unit for optical information

Title (en)

Recording method and recording unit for optical information

Title (de)

Aufnahmemethode und Aufnahmeeinheit für optische Information

Title (fr)

Procédé d'enregistrement et appareil d'enregistrement pour l' information optique

Publication

EP 1018727 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106331 A

Priority

  • EP 96932820 A
  • JP 26124695 A
  • JP 26126295 A
  • JP 19588096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5745467A] In mark length modulation recording, a mark end portion correction pulse train is added to a recording pulse train, or laser radiation with bias power is applied between the recording pulse train and laser radiation with cooling power or the mark end portion correction pulse train, furthermore, the start time of the cooling power radiation, the duration of the cooling power radiation, and the shape of the mark end portion correction pulse train are varied in accordance with the mark length to be recorded, further, in CAV mode, the start time of the cooling power radiation or the duration of the cooling power radiation is varied in accordance with disk radius position, and when the recording pulse train consists of a start pulse, an end pulse, and pulses between the start and end pulses, laser radiation with cooling power is applied, or laser radiation with bias power is applied between the recording pulse train and cooling power application, and when the recording pulse train is varied in accordance with mark length and mark spacing, the timing to start the laser radiation with cooling power is delayed by a predetermined amount from the end pulse or determined based on the clock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 7/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/0045 (2006.01); G11B 7/006 (2006.01); G11B 7/125 (2012.01); G11B 7/30 (2006.01); G11B 7/0055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/126 (2013.01); G11B 7/0045 (2013.01); G11B 7/00454 (2013.01); G11B 7/006 (2013.01); G11B 7/00557 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5745467 A 19980428; CN 1128442 C 20031119; CN 1137473 C 20040204; CN 1146869 C 20040421; CN 1173941 A 19980218; CN 1250210 A 20000412; CN 1250211 A 20000412; DE 69612833 D1 20010621; DE 69612833 T2 20010830; DE 69614005 D1 20010823; DE 69614005 T2 20011031; DE 69618034 D1 20020124; DE 69618034 T2 20020516; DE 69618680 D1 20020228; DE 69618680 T2 20020814; DE 69618681 D1 20020228; DE 69618681 T2 20020814; EP 0797193 A1 19970924; EP 0797193 A4 19990623; EP 0797193 B1 20010516; EP 0991058 A1 20000405; EP 0991058 B1 20010718; EP 0991059 A1 20000405; EP 0991059 B1 20011212; EP 1018727 A2 20000712; EP 1018727 A3 20000816; EP 1018727 B1 20020109; EP 1020850 A2 20000719; EP 1020850 A3 20000816; EP 1020850 B1 20020109; HK 1005275 A1 20040917; JP 2000155946 A 20000606; JP 4145958 B2 20080903; KR 100456957 B1 20050117; MX 9704098 A 19970930; TW 359812 B 19990601; WO 9714143 A1 19970417

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131004

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69618680

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131004

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121003

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69618680 20020228

2002-01-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 797193

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 797193

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB