Global Patent Index - EP 1018780 A1

EP 1018780 A1 2000-07-12 - Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (en)

Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (de)

Dielektrische Resonatorantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne diélectrique de résonateur

Publication

EP 1018780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99204260 A

Priority

DE 19858790 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19858790A1] The dielectric resonator antenna (8) is a rectangular block of ceramic dielectric and is one quarter of the size of ordinary resonators (1) because it has metallized walls in the position of the electric field symmetry planes (4,5) so that the same resonance frequency is obtained in only one quarter of the block.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine dielektrische Resonatorantenne (1) bestehend aus einem rechtwinkligen Quader aus einem dielektrischen Material, in dem eine elektrische Feldverteilung einer Eigenmode der dielektrischen Resonatorantenne (1), die insbesondere durch externe Anregung erzeugt wird, wenigstens zwei nicht parallele Symmetrieebenen (4, 5) besitzt. Um eine dielektrische Resonatorantenne (1) zu schaffen, die bessere Möglichkeiten zur Verkleinerung des Volumens und zur Installation innerhalb eines Gerätes bietet, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die parallel zu einer Schnittgeraden der Symmetrieebenen (4, 5) liegende Kante des Quaders zur Bildung der kürzesten Kante des Quaders vorgesehen ist. Die Länge dieser Kante wird mit d bezeichnet und ist bei einer dielektrischen Resonatorantenne (1) gemäß der Erfindung deutlich kleiner als die Länge der beiden anderen Kanten des Quaders. Um eine bessere und besonders flexible Verkleinerung des Antennenvolumens zu ermöglichen, muß die Länge wenigstens einer Kante reduziert werden. Überraschend zeigt sich, daß die Kante mit der Länge d ohne erheblichen Effizienzverlust der Antenne (1) deutlich verkürzt werden kann. Sowohl die Strahlungsleistung als auch die Genauigkeit der Resonanzfrequenz bleiben erhalten. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/10 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/40 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/24 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [EX] EP 0982799 A2 20000301 - PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al
  • [XA] MONGIA R K ET AL: "MEASUREMENT OF RADIATION EFFICIENCY OF DIELECTRIC RESONATOR ANTENNAS", IEEE MICROWAVE AND GUIDED WAVE LETTERS,US,IEEE INC, NEW YORK, vol. 4, no. 3, 1 March 1994 (1994-03-01), pages 80 - 82, XP000438190, ISSN: 1051-8207
  • [XA] MONGIA R K ET AL: "THEORETICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL INVESTIGATIONS ON RECTANGULAR DIELECTRIC RESONATOR ANTENNAS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 45, no. 9, 1 September 1997 (1997-09-01), pages 1348 - 1356, XP000695221, ISSN: 0018-926X
  • [DA] MONGIA R K ET AL: "Dielectric resonator antennas-a review and general design relations for resonant frequency and bandwidth", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MICROWAVE AND MILLIMETER-WAVE COMPUTER-AIDED ENGINEERING, JULY 1994, UK, vol. 4, no. 3, pages 230 - 247, XP000886739, ISSN: 1050-1827
  • [A] KELLER M G ET AL: "EHF dielectric resonator antenna array", MICROWAVE AND OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, 20 APRIL 1998, WILEY, USA, vol. 17, no. 6, pages 345 - 349, XP000886742, ISSN: 0895-2477
  • [A] MONGIA R K: "Dielectric resonator technology for satellite communications", 1996 ASIA-PACIFIC MICROWAVE CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS OF 1996 ASIA-PACIFIC MICROWAVE CONFERENCE (APMC'96), NEW DELHI, INDIA, 17-20 DEC. 1996, 1996, NEW DELHI, INDIA, R.S. GUPTA, UNIV. DELHI SOUTH CAMPUS, INDIA, PAGE(S) 1003 - 1006 VOL.3, XP000886744

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858790 A1 20000621; CN 1197199 C 20050413; CN 1261730 A 20000802; EP 1018780 A1 20000712; EP 1018780 B1 20020925; JP 2000209020 A 20000728; KR 100710726 B1 20070424; KR 20000048232 A 20000725; TW 439326 B 20010607; US 6323808 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902831 20021031

2002-10-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI