Global Patent Index - EP 1018780 B1

EP 1018780 B1 2002-09-25 - Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (en)

Dielectric resonator antenna

Title (de)

Dielektrische Resonatorantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne diélectrique de résonateur

Publication

EP 1018780 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99204260 A

Priority

DE 19858790 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19858790A1] The dielectric resonator antenna (8) is a rectangular block of ceramic dielectric and is one quarter of the size of ordinary resonators (1) because it has metallized walls in the position of the electric field symmetry planes (4,5) so that the same resonance frequency is obtained in only one quarter of the block.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/10 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/40 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/00 (2006.01); H01Q 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/24 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0485 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858790 A1 20000621; CN 1197199 C 20050413; CN 1261730 A 20000802; EP 1018780 A1 20000712; EP 1018780 B1 20020925; JP 2000209020 A 20000728; KR 100710726 B1 20070424; KR 20000048232 A 20000725; TW 439326 B 20010607; US 6323808 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071209

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902831 20021031

2002-10-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI