Global Patent Index - EP 1018855 A2

EP 1018855 A2 2000-07-12 - Gold-plated water heater element and method of making same

Title (en)

Gold-plated water heater element and method of making same

Title (de)

Vergoldeter Wassererhitzer und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Chauffe-eau revêtu d'or et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1018855 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310506 A

Priority

US 11413598 P

Abstract (en)

A self-cleaning water heater element is provided. The water heater element is plated with a layer of gold such that the gold surface has a low surface roughness. The smooth gold surface inhibits scale formation on the water heater element. The gold-plated smooth-surfaced water heater element may be manufactured by coating a standard water heater element with an adhesion layer, electroplating a layer of bright nickel on the adhesion layer, and electroplating a gold layer on top of the bright nickel layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/12 (2006.01); H05B 3/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/12 (2013.01); H05B 3/78 (2013.01); H05B 2203/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018855 A2 20000712; EP 1018855 A3 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031122

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/78 A, 7H 05B 3/82 B

2000-10-25 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUGHES, DENNIS R.

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KNOEPPEL, RAY O.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AOS HOLDING COMPANY

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI