Global Patent Index - EP 1018856 A1

EP 1018856 A1 2000-07-12 - Microwave system with at least two magnetrons and method for controlling such a system

Title (en)

Microwave system with at least two magnetrons and method for controlling such a system

Title (de)

Mikrowelleneinrichtung mit minderstens zwei Magnetrons und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer solchen Einrichtung

Title (fr)

Installation micro-onde à deux magnétrons au moins et procédé de contrôle d'une telle installation

Publication

EP 1018856 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420001 A

Priority

EP 99420001 A

Abstract (en)

the circuit uses two magnetrons at the base of T-shaped guides feeding into a common circuit. The heating system includes an applicator or oven (5) supplied by two separate magnetrons (11,12). The magnetrons are mounted on the conjugate branches (3,4) of a magic T or directive coupler forming a ring. The other branches of the device are directed to irradiate the material (10) within the oven (5). Impedance adapters (8,9) are arranged within the branches (3,4) and/or in front of the magnetrons (11,12) to decouple the operation of the magnetrons and transmit all the power emitted by the magnetrons into the material (10). further control may be applied to the impedance adapters, for example using double balanced mixers, to obtain a constant and homogenous maximum power delivery to the heated sample. They may alternatively achieve a modulated power with maximum at the centre and minimum on the surface.

Abstract (fr)

On décrit une installation de chauffage ou de traitement micro-onde d'un matériau ou d'objet comprenant un applicateur ou four (5) alimenté par deux magnétrons (11,12) séparés Les magnétrons sont montés sur les branches (3,4) conjuguées d'un Té magique ou d'un coupleur directif, formant un anneau. Les autres branches (1,2) conjuguées irradient le matériau (10). On dispose des adaptateurs d'impédance (8,9) dans les branches (3,4) et/ou devant les magnétrons (11,12) pour découpler le fonctionnement des magnétrons et transmettre toute la puissance émise par les magnétrons au matériau ou à l'objet. Un procédé est décrit qui permet par réglages des adaptateurs d'impédance, par exemple à l'aide de doubles mélangeurs équilibrés, d'obtenir une distribution constante, homogène et maximale sur le matériau ou l'objet, ou au contraire d'obtenir une distribution modulée sur le matériau ou l'objet, notamment maximale au centre et moindre en surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/70; H05B 6/72; H05B 6/74; H05B 6/80; H01P 5/20; H01P 5/16; H01P 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/16 (2006.01); H05B 6/70 (2006.01); H05B 6/72 (2006.01); H05B 6/74 (2006.01); H05B 6/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6402 (2013.01); H01P 5/16 (2013.01); H05B 6/704 (2013.01); H05B 6/705 (2013.01); H05B 6/708 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018856 A1 20000712

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050310

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021028

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: R.I.M.M. TECHNOLOGIES N.V.

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI