Global Patent Index - EP 1018902 A1

EP 1018902 A1 2000-07-19 - SHAPING INSERT

Title (en)

SHAPING INSERT

Title (de)

FORMBÜGEL

Title (fr)

ARMATURE DE SOUTIEN-GORGE

Publication

EP 1018902 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952639 A

Priority

  • DE 19743501 A
  • DE 19743684 A
  • EP 9806084 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6241576B1] The invention relates to a shaping insert (1) for garments for supporting a woman's bust. The aim of the invention is to provide as much bend resistance as possible in the plane stressed by the insert and as much flexibility as possible in relation to bending stresses perpendicular thereto. At the same time, the insert should be as economical as possible to produce. To this end, the insert is configured with at least two insert elements (2, 3) which are arranged essentially one behind the other in the direction perpendicular to the plane which is stressed by the insert. The two insert elements are curved essentially identically either side of the bottom of the insert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/126 (2013.01); A41C 3/122 (2013.01); A41C 3/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916323A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6241576 B1 20010605; AU 1026499 A 19990423; EP 1018902 A1 20000719; EP 1018902 B1 20011121; ES 2167952 T3 20020516; WO 9916323 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090925

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090924

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090924

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090924

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167952 T3

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT