Global Patent Index - EP 1018983 A1

EP 1018983 A1 2000-07-19 - METHOD OF PRODUCING BIOMATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING BIOMATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BIOMATERIALEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES BIOMATERIAUX

Publication

EP 1018983 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906166 A

Priority

  • US 9802243 W
  • US 79842597 A
  • US 79842697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836707A1] It is a general object of the invention to provide a method of effecting tissue repair or replacement using a biomaterial. It is a specific object of the invention to provide a biomaterial suitable for use as a stent, for example, a vascular stent, or as conduit replacement, as an artery, vein or a ureter replacement. The biomaterial can also be used as a stent or conduit covering or lining. The present invention relates to a method of repairing, replacing or supporting a section of a body tissue. The method comprises positioning a biomaterial at the site of the section and bonding the biomaterial to the site or to the tissue surrounding the site. The bonding is effected by contacting the biomaterial and the site, or tissue surrounding the site, at the point at which said bonding is to be effected, with an energy absorbing agent. The agent is then exposed to an amount of energy absorbable by the agent sufficient to bond the biomaterial to the site or to the tissue surrounding the site.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 2/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/06 (2013.01); A61L 27/22 (2006.01); A61L 27/36 (2006.01); A61L 27/38 (2006.01); A61L 27/50 (2006.01); A61L 31/00 (2006.01); A61L 31/04 (2006.01); A61L 31/14 (2006.01); A61F 2/04 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 27/3839 (2013.01); A61F 2/0063 (2013.01); A61F 2/06 (2013.01); A61L 27/227 (2013.01); A61L 27/3683 (2013.01); A61L 27/3804 (2013.01); A61L 27/50 (2013.01); A61L 31/005 (2013.01); A61L 31/047 (2013.01); A61L 31/14 (2013.01); A61F 2/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836707 A1 19980827; AU 6146698 A 19980909; AU 748911 B2 20020613; CA 2279907 A1 19980827; EP 1018983 A1 20000719; EP 1018983 A4 20060927

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070123

2006-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060830

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-OREGON

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GREGORY, KENTON W.

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SISTERS OF PROVIDENCE IN OREGON

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GREGORY, KENTON W.

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE