Global Patent Index - EP 1019009 A1

EP 1019009 A1 2000-07-19 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING VOLUMES OF SMALL AMOUNTS OF PRODUCTS AND FOR FILLING THE SAME IN RECEPTACLES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MEASURING VOLUMES OF SMALL AMOUNTS OF PRODUCTS AND FOR FILLING THE SAME IN RECEPTACLES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VOLUMETRISCHEN ABMESSEN KLEINER GUTMENGEN UND ABFÜLLEN DIESER IN BEHÄLTNISSE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MESURAGE VOLUMETRIQUE DE PETITES QUANTITES DE MATIERE ET EMPLISSAGE DE CONTENANTS AVEC CES QUANTITES

Publication

EP 1019009 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936172 A

Priority

  • DE 9801627 W
  • DE 19743088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19743088A1] The invention relates to a device for measuring volumes of small amounts of products and for filling the same in receptacles (a), comprising a dosing plate (11) which rotates around a vertical axis (13) and dosing chambers (15) shaped as through holes which are arranged in groups in a pitch circle. In order to close the lower openings of the dosing chambers (15), displaceable slides (17) having though holes (18) are arranged on the bottom side of the dosing plate (11), which close the dosing chambers (15) in the filling position and open them in the emptying position. The slides (17) are pulled to the filling position by a spring (27) and pushed to an emptying position by a controlled stop (33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 3/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 3/07 (2006.01); B05B 1/04 (2006.01); B65B 1/30 (2006.01); B65B 1/36 (2006.01); B65B 43/42 (2006.01); G01F 11/30 (2006.01); G01F 22/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 3/074 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916404A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19743088 A1 19990401; CN 1158059 C 20040721; CN 1272056 A 20001101; CZ 20001138 A3 20000816; CZ 296751 B6 20060614; EP 1019009 A1 20000719; EP 1019009 B1 20011024; ES 2166176 T3 20020401; JP 2001517542 A 20011009; JP 4065662 B2 20080326; SK 4392000 A3 20001009; TW 385290 B 20000321; US 6286567 B1 20010911; WO 9916404 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140616

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130617

2014-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130616

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130622

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130616

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120628

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166176

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-29

2001-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE