Global patent index - EP 1019027 A1

EP 1019027 A1 2000-07-19 - IMPLANTABLE COLLAGEN-CONTAINING PUTTY MATERIAL

Title (en)

IMPLANTABLE COLLAGEN-CONTAINING PUTTY MATERIAL

Title (de)

IMPLANTIERBARES KOLLAGENHALTIGES KITTMATERIAL

Title (fr)

MATERIAU IMPLANTABLE DE TYPE MASTIC, A BASE DE COLLAGENE

Publication

EP 1019027 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908535 A

Priority

  • US 9802751 W
  • US 3707197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835653A1] The present invention provides compositions for an implantable putty material for delivery of active compounds to a patient. More specifically, the present invention provides a material having a pH of between about 3 and 6 and possessing a putty like physical property, wherein the composition of the material includes collagen and water. The present invention also provides a method for using the implantable putty material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 26/00; A61F 13/00; A61K 9/14; A61K 38/00; A61K 38/18; A61K 38/39; A61L 27/24; C07C 53/08; C07K 1/00; C07K 14/475; C07K 14/495; C07K 14/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/28 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61L 24/10 (2006.01); A61L 27/00 (2006.01); A61L 27/24 (2006.01); A61P 19/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 24/102 (2013.01); A61L 27/24 (2013.01); A61F 2310/00365 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835653 A1 19980820; AU 6654598 A 19980908; CA 2280966 A1 19980820; CA 2280966 C 20120417; EP 1019027 A1 20000719; EP 1019027 A4 20040512; JP 2001521414 A 20011106; JP 5105216 B2 20121226

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIMMER ORTHOBIOLOGICS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61L 26/00 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61L 27/24 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/14 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/00 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/18 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/39 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 1/00 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/78 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/475 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/495 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 07C 53/08 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61F 13/00 B

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER BIOLOGICS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19990913;LT PAYMENT 19990913;LV PAYMENT 19990913;MK PAYMENT 19990913;RO PAYMENT 19990913;SI PAYMENT 19990913