Global Patent Index - EP 1019070 A1

EP 1019070 A1 2000-07-19 - BRADYKININ ANALOGS AS SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF CELL ACTIVATION

Title (en)

BRADYKININ ANALOGS AS SELECTIVE INHIBITORS OF CELL ACTIVATION

Title (de)

BRADYKININ ANALOGE ALS SELEKTIVE INHIBITOREN DER ZELLAKTIVIERUNG

Title (fr)

ANALOGUES DE BRADYKININE INHIBITEURS SELECTIFS DE L'ACTIVATION CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 1019070 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919827 A

Priority

  • US 9808015 W
  • US 4608597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847522A1] The present invention provides bradykinin peptide analogs, compositions, and methods of inhibiting thrombin-induced platelet and other cell activation. The bradykinin analogs comprise single or multiple peptide segments. The invention also provides a method for identifying compounds that selectively inhibit thrombin-induced platelet and other cell activation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A61K 38/02; A61K 38/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/04 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 5/09 (2006.01); C07K 7/18 (2006.01); C07K 14/81 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 5/0817 (2013.01); A61K 38/043 (2013.01); C07K 7/18 (2013.01); C07K 14/8139 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847522 A1 19981029; AU 7252898 A 19981113; AU 734935 B2 20010628; CA 2288027 A1 19981029; EP 1019070 A1 20000719; EP 1019070 A4 20010516; IL 132546 D0 20010319; JP 2001518119 A 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030876

2009-08-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090218

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 14/81 A, 7C 07K 7/18 B, 7C 07K 5/08 B, 7A 61K 38/04 B, 7A 61K 38/06 B, 7A 61K 38/57 B

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991101

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE