Global Patent Index - EP 1019092 A1

EP 1019092 A1 2000-07-19 - THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC TOOLS FOR IMPAIRED GLUCOSE TOLERANCE CONDITIONS

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC TOOLS FOR IMPAIRED GLUCOSE TOLERANCE CONDITIONS

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE UND DIAGNOSTISCHE MITTEL FÜR KRANKHEITEN MIT GESTÖRTER GLUKOSE-TOLERANZ

Title (fr)

OUTILS THERAPEUTIQUES ET DIAGNOSTIQUES POUR DESORDRES LIES A UNE MAUVAISE TOLERANCE GLUCIDIQUE

Publication

EP 1019092 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922382 A

Priority

  • US 9810080 W
  • US 85707697 A
  • US 88853497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851351A1] Disclosed herein are novel genes and methods for the screening of therapeutics useful for treating impaired glucose tolerance conditions, as well as diagnostics and therapeutic compositions for identifying or treating such conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 49/00; C07H 21/04; C12N 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/033 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/16 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/0336 (2013.01); A61K 49/0004 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01); C07K 14/70596 (2013.01); C12N 9/16 (2013.01); C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); G01N 33/5085 (2013.01); A01K 2207/15 (2013.01); A01K 2217/00 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2217/075 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0306 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0362 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); G01N 2333/4353 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851351 A1 19981119; AU 7494198 A 19981208; AU 752962 B2 20021003; CA 2287839 A1 19981119; EP 1019092 A1 20000719; EP 1019092 A4 20041215; JP 2002511747 A 20020416; PL 336858 A1 20000717

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-12-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029741

2004-12-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041102

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUVKUN, GARY

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KIMURA, KOUTAROU

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PATTERSON, GARTH

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OGG, SCOTT

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARADIS, SUZANNE

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TISSENBAUM, HEIDI

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORRIS, JASON

2000-10-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOWEEK, ALLISON

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991215

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE