Global Patent Index - EP 1019198 A1

EP 1019198 A1 2000-07-19 - SHOWER SYSTEM WITH ADJUSTABLE STREAMS

Title (en)

SHOWER SYSTEM WITH ADJUSTABLE STREAMS

Title (de)

DUSCHANORDNUNG MIT STRAHLARTEINSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DOUCHE A JET REGLABLE

Publication

EP 1019198 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956841 A

Priority

  • DE 19743477 A
  • EP 9806253 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916551A1] The invention relates to a shower system with a shower head (18) which is connected to a mixer faucet (12) for warm and cold water via a water delivery channel (16) and can be operated with various, according to selection streams. According to the invention, a remote control unit is provided for adjusting the stream of the shower head in order to enable an easier and more reliable change of the stream. To this end, an actuating element is located at a distance from the shower head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/18; B05B 1/16; E03C 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/16 (2006.01); B05B 1/18 (2006.01); E03C 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/055 (2013.01); E03C 1/052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916551A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916551 A1 19990408; DE 19743477 A1 19990429; EP 1019198 A1 20000719; EP 1019198 B1 20041208; JP 2001518579 A 20011016; US 6322005 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812369

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812369 P 20050113

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020402

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT