Global Patent Index - EP 1019207 A1

EP 1019207 A1 2000-07-19 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING

Title (de)

STRANGGIESSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COULEE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 1019207 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941135 A

Priority

  • AT 9800203 W
  • AT 149397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912676A1] The invention relates to a device for continuous casting with a mold supporting device (4) and a mold (1) which is mounted in an oscillating manner and located opposite from said supporting device (4). Said mold (1) extends in a crosswise manner (III) over the mold supporting device (4) and supports forces in the elastic area of contained guiding elements (7, 10). The guiding elements (7, 10) are approximately parallel to one another and are arranged in an oscillating direction (III) located above one another at a distance (12). In order to provide high guiding precision during limited space requirements and with only low driving forces for the oscillation drive (14) of the mold (1), a first guiding element (7) extends from the mold supporting device (4) to the mold (1) in a first direction (I) and at least one second guiding element (10) extends from the mold supporting device (4) to the mold (1) in a direction (II) which is opposite the first direction (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9912676A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912676 A1 19990318; AT 406456 B 20000525; AT A149397 A 19991015; CN 1092549 C 20021016; CN 1269739 A 20001011; DE 59806073 D1 20021128; EP 1019207 A1 20000719; EP 1019207 B1 20021023; EP 1019207 B2 20111109; US 6550527 B1 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, LINZ, AT

- Document: DE 59806073

2016-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806073

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806073

- Representative's name: KINNSTAETTER, KLAUS, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2016-05-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20160413

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150818

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH, LINZ, AT

- Document: DE 59806073

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH, LINZ, AT

- Document: DE 59806073

- Effective date: 20120117

2011-12-29 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59806073

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2011-11-09 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59806073

2008-12-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

2008-11-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH

2008-10-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VAI METALS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO

2003-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DANIELI & C.OFFICINE MECCANICHE SPA

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806073 20021128

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT