Global Patent Index - EP 1019218 A1

EP 1019218 A1 2000-07-19 - SHARPENING OF FITTINGS

Title (en)

SHARPENING OF FITTINGS

Title (de)

SCHLEIFEN VON GARNITUREN

Title (fr)

AFFUTAGE DE GARNITURES

Publication

EP 1019218 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941653 A

Priority

  • CH 230297 A
  • IB 9801471 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916579A1] The invention relates to a sharpening device for the card of a carding machine comprising elastically bendable elements which penetrate between the fitting points, scan the lateral surfaces of the points and carry out the sharpening thereof, whereby the ground material is carried away by suction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/18; B24B 47/22; B24B 49/00; B24B 55/06; D01G 15/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2006.01); B24B 47/22 (2006.01); B24B 49/00 (2012.01); B24B 55/06 (2006.01); D01G 15/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/18 (2013.01); B24B 47/22 (2013.01); B24B 49/00 (2013.01); B24B 55/06 (2013.01); D01G 15/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916579A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916579 A1 19990408; DE 59810482 D1 20040129; DE 59812916 D1 20050811; EP 1019218 A1 20000719; EP 1019218 B1 20031217; EP 1329288 A2 20030723; EP 1329288 A3 20030730; EP 1329288 B1 20050706; TR 200000838 T2 20010921; TR 200200055 T2 20020621; US 6431969 B1 20020813

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080923

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080923

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2005-09-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-05-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011227

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI