Global Patent Index - EP 1019221 B1

EP 1019221 B1 2002-11-20 - ABRASIVE DISK

Title (en)

ABRASIVE DISK

Title (de)

SCHLEIFSCHEIBE

Title (fr)

DISQUE ABRASIF

Publication

EP 1019221 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98946537 A

Priority

  • FR 9802097 W
  • FR 9712198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768955A1] The invention concerns an abrasive disk comprising a support perforated in its centre for being mounted, and whereof the working zone comprises at least an "active" zone provided with abrasive means and at least a continuous "inactive" zone devoid of abrasive means.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/16; B24D 7/06; B24D 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 7/06 (2006.01); B24D 7/18 (2006.01); B24D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 7/06 (2013.01); B24D 7/18 (2013.01); B24D 13/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768955 A1 19990402; FR 2768955 B1 19991105; AU 9355198 A 19990423; DE 69809579 D1 20030102; DE 69809579 T2 20030904; EP 1019221 A1 20000719; EP 1019221 B1 20021120; ES 2188015 T3 20030616; IL 135403 A 20050517; IL 135403 D0 20010520; IT 1297017 B1 19990803; IT MI972868 A1 19990401; WO 9916583 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180501

2018-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171101

2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171001

2018-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171001

2018-06-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171101

2018-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809579

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151031

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151002

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20160603

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141003

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SAINT- GOBAIN ABRASIFS

2003-08-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SAINT- GOBAIN NORTON

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188015 T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809579 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB NL

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000427

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB NL

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000427