Global Patent Index - EP 1019276 A1

EP 1019276 A1 2000-07-19 - FRONT SECTION OF A RAILWAY CAR

Title (en)

FRONT SECTION OF A RAILWAY CAR

Title (de)

EISENBAHNWAGEN-VORBAU

Title (fr)

AVANT-CORPS DE VEHICULE FERROVIAIRE

Publication

EP 1019276 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98950090 A

Priority

  • CZ 308597 A
  • EP 9806175 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916652A1] The invention relates to the front section of a railway car comprising a motor transverse beam (2) which is horizontally arranged and vertical to the railway car axis (1). Both front section ends are firmly connected to the longitudinal supports located on the sides of a railway car (1), said supports being parallel to the railway car axis (1). The longitudinal supports (10) extend along the railway car axis (1) as diagonal longitudinal supports (3) from the motor transverse beam (2) toward the buffer elements (4). The longitudinal support ends which are situated opposite the motor transverse beam (2) are firmly connected to said buffer elements (4). A coupling support (6) is arranged in the middle of the motor transverse beam (2). Supports (5) which diagonally extend forward are firmly connected to said coupling support and the buffer elements (4). This results in forming a more compact nose of the inventive front section. The nose can be strengthened above and below by firmly connecting said nose to floor panels (7). The floor panels can have stabilizing reinforcing elements (8). The rear part of the front section extends from the motor transverse beam (2) to a horizontal crossover transverse beam (9) in a direction toward the middle of the car. Both crossover transverse beam ends are firmly connected to the longitudinal supports (10). In addition, horizontally extending floor panels (7) are provided above or below said rear part and the floor panels can have stabilizing reinforcing elements (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 1/10; B61D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 11/00 (2006.01); B61D 15/06 (2006.01); B61D 17/06 (2006.01); B61F 1/10 (2006.01); B61G 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 15/06 (2013.01); B61F 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916652A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916652 A1 19990408; AT 214347 T 20020315; AU 736155 B2 20010726; AU 9628798 A 19990423; CA 2306043 A1 19990408; CZ 284735 B6 19990217; CZ 9703085 A3 19990217; DE 59803362 D1 20020418; EP 1019276 A1 20000719; EP 1019276 B1 20020313; ES 2173630 T3 20021016; HU 0003752 A2 20010228; HU 0003752 A3 20011029; HU 221287 B1 20020928; PL 190686 B1 20051230; PL 339549 A1 20001218; PT 1019276 E 20020731; RU 2218286 C2 20031210; US 6435102 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803362

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 214347 T

- Effective date: 20140929

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-10-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141008

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130929

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130929

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-04-08 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173630 T3

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803362 20020418

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI IT PT SE

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214347 T 20020315

2001-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI IT PT SE