Global Patent Index - EP 1019404 A1

EP 1019404 A1 2000-07-19 - PURINE ACYCLONUCLEOSIDES AS ANTIVIRAL AGENTS

Title (en)

PURINE ACYCLONUCLEOSIDES AS ANTIVIRAL AGENTS

Title (de)

PURIN-ACYCLONUKELOTIDE ALS ANTIVIRALE MITTEL

Title (fr)

ACYCLONUCLEOSIDES DE PURINE UTILISES COMME AGENTS ANTIVIRAUX

Publication

EP 1019404 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942377 A

Priority

  • AU 9800748 W
  • AU PO912997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9912927A1] This invention relates to the use of a compound of formula (1) where: R<1> is hydrogen, halogen, hydroxy, azido, alkoxy, aryloxy, thio, alkylthio, amino, alkylamino, hydrazino, hydroxylamino, benzyloxy, NRR' or NRCOR'; R<2> is hydrogen, halogen, hydroxy, azido, alkoxy, aryloxy, thio, alkylthio, amino, alkylamino, hydrazino, hydroxylamino, benzyloxy, NRR' or NRCOR'; and R and R' are independently selected from hydrogen, alkyl and aryl; or a salt and pharmaceutically acceptable derivatives thereof; in the treatment and/or prophylaxis of hepatitis B viral infection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 473/18; A61K 31/52; C07D 473/00; C07D 473/16; C07D 473/24; C07D 473/32; C07D 473/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 473/16 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61P 31/20 (2006.01); C07D 473/18 (2006.01); C07D 473/24 (2006.01); C07D 473/32 (2006.01); C07D 473/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 473/18 (2013.01); C07D 473/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9912927 A1 19990318; AU PO912997 D0 19971002; CA 2302630 A1 19990318; CN 1269801 A 20001011; EP 1019404 A1 20000719; EP 1019404 A4 20010704; ID 26937 A 20010222; JP 2001515900 A 20010925; NZ 502994 A 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029586

2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040401

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-07-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE