Global patent index - EP 1019411 A1

EP 1019411 A1 2000-07-19 - PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIZING CARBAPENEM SIDE CHAIN INTERMEDIATES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIZING CARBAPENEM SIDE CHAIN INTERMEDIATES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZWISCHENPRODUKTEN FÜR CARBAPENEM-SEITENKETTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SYNTHETISATION D'INTERMEDIAIRES DE CARBAPENEM A CHAINE LATERALE

Publication

EP 1019411 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933069 A

Priority

  • GB 9810184 A
  • US 9813738 W
  • US 5203297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902531A1] A process of synthesizing a compound of formula (1) is described. A compound of formula (2) is reacted with diphenylphosphinic chloride to activate the carboxylic acid group, and then reacted with methanesulfonyl chloride to produce a compound of formula (4). Compound (4) is then reacted with a group II metal sulfide source in water to produce a compound of formula (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 495/08; C07D 207/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/16 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C07D 495/08 (2006.01); C07F 9/572 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 409/12 (2013.01); C07D 207/16 (2013.01); C07D 495/08 (2013.01); C07F 9/5721 (2013.01); C07F 9/5722 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902531 A1 19990121; AU 731586 B2 20010405; AU 8282198 A 19990208; CA 2294342 A1 19990121; CA 2294342 C 20060314; EP 1019411 A1 20000719; EP 1019411 A4 20030813; JP 2002504156 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090526

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070810

2003-08-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 495/08 A, 7C 07D 207/12 B, 7C 07D 207/16 B, 7C 07D 409/12 B, 7C 07F 9/572 B, 7C 07D 495/08 J, 7C 07D 333:00 J, 7C 07D 209:00 J

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE