Global Patent Index - EP 1019427 A4

EP 1019427 A4 2000-07-19 - N?6 -SUBSTITUTED-ADENOSINE-5'-URONAMIDES AS ADENOSINE RECEPTOR MODULATORS

Title (en)

N?6 -SUBSTITUTED-ADENOSINE-5'-URONAMIDES AS ADENOSINE RECEPTOR MODULATORS

Title (de)

N6-SUBSTITUIERTE ADENOSIN-5'-URONAMIDE ALS ADENOSIN-REZEPTOR-MODULATOREN

Title (fr)

N?6 -SUBSTITUES-ADENOSINE-5'-URONAMIDES UTILES COMME MODULATEURS DE RECEPTEURS D'ADENOSINE

Publication

EP 1019427 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98939156 A

Priority

  • US 9816053 W
  • US 5406497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906053A1] A series of adenosine-5'-uronamide derivatives bearing N<6>-arylurea, alkarylurea, heteroarylurea, arylcarbonyl, alkarylcarbonyl or heteroarylcarbonyl groups which have affinity and, in some cases, selectivity for the adenosine A1 or A3 receptors are disclosed. These compounds can be used in a pharmaceutical composition to treat disorders caused by excessive activation of the A1 or A3 receptors, or can be used in a diagnostic application to determine the relative binding of other compounds to the A1 or A3 receptors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 19/16; A61K 31/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 19/167 (2006.01); A61K 31/7042 (2006.01); A61K 31/7052 (2006.01); A61K 31/7076 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61P 11/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07H 19/16 (2006.01); C07H 19/173 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 19/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] WO 9850047 A1 19981112 - UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al
  • [Y] C.GALLO-RODRIGUEZ ET AL.: "Structure Activity Relationships of N6-Benzyladenosine-5'-uronamides as A3 Selective Adenosine Agonists.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., vol. 37, no. 5, 4 March 1994 (1994-03-04), AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, pages 636 - 646, XP002136400, ISSN: 0022-2623
  • [Y] H.O.KIM ET AL.: "2-Substitution of N6-Benzoyladenosine-5'-Uronamides Enhances Selectivity for A3 Adenosine Receptors.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., vol. 37, no. 21, 14 October 1994 (1994-10-14), AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, pages 3614 - 3621, XP002136401, ISSN: 0022-2623
  • See also references of WO 9906053A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906053 A1 19990211; AU 8764398 A 19990222; CA 2296485 A1 19990211; EP 1019427 A1 20000719; EP 1019427 A4 20000719; JP 2003517423 A 20030527

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-07-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE