Global Patent Index - EP 1019435 A4

EP 1019435 A4 2001-12-12 - AMPLIFICATION OF RESPONSE FROM EXPRESSED RECOMBINANT PROTEIN

Title (en)

AMPLIFICATION OF RESPONSE FROM EXPRESSED RECOMBINANT PROTEIN

Title (de)

AMPLIFIZIERUNG DER WIRKSAMKEIT EXPRIMIERTER REKOMBINANTER PROTEINE

Title (fr)

AMPLIFICATION DE LA REPONSE D'UNE PROTEINE DE RECOMBINAISON EXPRIMEE

Publication

EP 1019435 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97906880 A

Priority

  • US 9701394 W
  • US 59356096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9727216A1] The present invention relates to a method for amplifying the response from a protein expressed from a recombinant vaccinia vector. The present invention may be used to amplify the intended effect of expressed proteins in any method where such expression is desired, for example, in vaccine production, vaccination and gene therapy. The present invention also relates to synthetic peptides, nucleic acid sequences, preferably DNA sequences and constructs comprising a vector linked to a DNA segment which encodes a protein containing a signal peptide at its N-terminus and an anchor sequence at its C-terminus. These expression vectors are generally useful for expressing polypeptides in a variety of animal cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/00; A61K 31/70; A61K 39/00; C07K 14/005; C07K 14/035; C07K 14/07; C07K 14/195; C07K 14/435; C07K 14/475; C07K 14/525; C07K 14/575

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 38/36 (2006.01); A61K 38/43 (2006.01); A61K 39/245 (2006.01); A61K 39/25 (2006.01); A61K 39/285 (2006.01); A61K 39/29 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/005 (2006.01); C07K 14/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/035 (2006.01); C07K 14/045 (2006.01); C07K 14/07 (2006.01); C07K 14/195 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/525 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); C12N 15/62 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/02 (2013.01); C07K 2319/035 (2013.01); C07K 2319/40 (2013.01); C12N 2710/16622 (2013.01); C12N 2710/16722 (2013.01); C12N 2730/10122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 8901041 A1 19890209 - GENENTECH INC [US]
  • [X] WO 9418330 A1 19940818 - UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al
  • [A] WO 8907140 A1 19890810 - COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]
  • [A] SRINIVASAN J ET AL: "Targeting vaccinia virus-expressed secretory beta subunit of human chorionic gonadotropin to the cell surface induces antibodies.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, vol. 63, no. 12, 1995, pages 4907 - 4911, XP002172672, ISSN: 0019-9567
  • [A] TAUER THOMAS J ET AL: "Expression of the insulin receptor with a recombinant vaccinia virus: Biochemical evidence that the insulin receptor has intrinsic serine kinase activity.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 271, no. 1, 1996, pages 331 - 336, XP002172673, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [A] LEE S W ET AL: "EXPRESSION OF AN ANCHORED UROKINASE IN THE APICAL ENDOTHELIAL-CELL MEMBRANE - PRESERVATION OF ENZYMATIC-ACTIVITY AND ENHANCEMENT OF CELL-SURFACE PLASMINOGEN ACTIVATION", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (25 JUN 1992) VOL. 267, NO. 18, PP. 13020-13027. ISSN: 0021-9258., - 25 June 1992 (1992-06-25), NHLBI, MOLEC HEMATOL BRANCH, BLDG 10, RM 7D-18, BETHESDA, MD, 20892, XP002172674
  • See also references of WO 9727216A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9727216 A1 19970731; AU 2248997 A 19970820; AU 724621 B2 20000928; EP 1019435 A1 20000719; EP 1019435 A4 20011212; JP 2000504330 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020819

2001-12-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980907

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE