Global Patent Index - EP 1019466 A1

EP 1019466 A1 2000-07-19 - POLYALKYLENE SUCCINIMIDE COMPOSITION USEFUL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

POLYALKYLENE SUCCINIMIDE COMPOSITION USEFUL IN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

POLYALKYLENSUCCINIMID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION A BASE DE POLYALKYLENE SUCCINIMIDE DESTINEE AUX MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1019466 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949715 A

Priority

  • JP 28466697 A
  • US 9820715 W
  • US 1580198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916852A1] A lubricating oil composition for internal combustion engines is preferably composed of a major portion of a base oil; 0.5 % to 15 % of a cyclic carbonate-treated polyalkylene succinimide additive; 0.5 % to 15 % of a borated polyalkylene succinimide additive; 0.5 % to 20 % of a metal-containing detergent; and 0.1 % to 3 % of a zinc dialkyldithiophosphate, other additives such as a molybdenum compound, an oxidation inhibitor and a viscosity index improver can be added. The molecular weight of the polyalkylenes from which the carbonated polyalkylene succinimide is derived is preferably at least 300 greater than the molecular weight of the polyalkylenes from which the borated polyalkylene succinimide is derived.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 141/12; C10M 133/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 8/00 (2006.01); C10M 133/56 (2006.01); C10M 141/10 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C08F 8/00 (2013.01); C08F 8/32 (2013.01); C08F 8/42 (2013.01); C08F 8/48 (2013.01); C10M 133/56 (2013.01); C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/144 (2013.01); C10M 2207/146 (2013.01); C10M 2207/16 (2013.01); C10M 2207/26 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2227/00 (2013.01); C10M 2227/06 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2227/062 (2013.01); C10M 2227/063 (2013.01); C10M 2227/065 (2013.01); C10M 2227/066 (2013.01); C10M 2227/09 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 133/56 + C10M 133/56
  2. C10M 141/10 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 129/54 + C10M 129/58 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 137/10
  3. C10M 163/00 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 159/20 + C10M 159/22 + C10M 159/24
  4. C10M 2215/28 + C10M 2215/28
  5. C08F 8/32 + C08F 110/08
  6. C08F 8/48 + C08F 8/32 + C08F 110/08
  7. C08F 8/42 + C08F 8/48 + C08F 8/32 + C08F 110/08
  8. C08F 8/00 + C08F 8/48 + C08F 8/32 + C08F 110/08

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916852A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916852 A1 19990408; CA 2305637 A1 19990408; EP 1019466 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON ORONITE COMPANY LLC

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORONITE JAPAN LIMITED

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORONITE JAPAN LIMITED

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB