Global Patent Index - EP 1019478 A1

EP 1019478 A1 2000-07-19 - DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DETERGENTE

Publication

EP 1019478 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97930425 A

Priority

  • EP 9703371 W
  • GB 9613758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800500A1] A composition comprising a peptide or protein Deposition Aid having a high affinity for fibres or a surface and attached/adsorbed to the peptide or protein deposition aid a benefit agent. The composition effectively deposits the Benefit Agent onto fabric during the wash cycle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 3/38; D06M 15/15; D06M 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); D06M 15/15 (2006.01); D06M 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 16/003 (2013.01); C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); D06M 15/15 (2013.01); D06M 16/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9800500A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800500 A1 19980108; AR 007691 A1 19991110; AU 3438197 A 19980121; BR 9710021 A 19990810; DE 69734073 D1 20050929; DE 69734073 T2 20060608; DE 69734073 T3 20100902; EP 1019478 A1 20000719; EP 1019478 B1 20050824; EP 1019478 B2 20100526; ES 2245795 T3 20060116; ES 2245795 T5 20101020; GB 9613758 D0 19960904; IN 189556 B 20030329; ZA 9705816 B 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160624

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69734073

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150617

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-20 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2010-05-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER AND GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20060523

2006-06-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER AND GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 20060523

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245795 T3

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69734073 P 20050929

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030227

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981211

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT