Global Patent Index - EP 1019486 A1

EP 1019486 A1 2000-07-19 - COMPOSITION FOR USE IN A WASHING MACHINE

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR USE IN A WASHING MACHINE

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER WASCHMASCHINE

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POUR UTILISATION DANS UN LAVE-LINGE

Publication

EP 1019486 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939398 A

Priority

  • DE 19834179 A
  • EP 9905264 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0006683A1] A composition for use in a washing machine, characterized by a basic composition in the form of a tablet acting essentially during the main wash cycle of the washing machine and by at least one particle that is made up of at least one nucleus comprising at least one substance that acts mainly during the rinsing processes of the washing machine in addition to a coat that fully surrounds the nucleus or nuclei and comprises at least one compound whose solubility increases when the concentration of a specific ion in the ambient medium is reduced. At least one particle is arranged in or on the tablet, whereby the surface of the particle or particles comes into direct contact with the surface of the basic composition surrounding said particle or particles until the tablet dissolves to a quasi-total extent, whereby the envelope is prevented from dissolving or the envelope is prevented from detaching itself from the nucleus (or nuclei) in a substantial manner. The invention also relates to a method for carrying out a wash cycle in a washing machine using the inventive composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0091 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006683A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0006683 A1 20000210; AU 5371399 A 20000221; CA 2304526 A1 20000210; EP 1019486 A1 20000719; US 6660704 B1 20031209

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070215

2007-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECKITT BENCKISER N.V.

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050314

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECKITT BENCKISER N.V.

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE