Global patent index - EP 1019542 A1

EP 1019542 A1 2000-07-19 - METHODS TO MODULATE BLOOD PRESSURE AND DIAGNOSE BARTTER'S SYNDROME TYPE III

Title (en)

METHODS TO MODULATE BLOOD PRESSURE AND DIAGNOSE BARTTER'S SYNDROME TYPE III

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DES BLUTDRUCKS UND ZUR DIAGNOSE VON BARTTER'S SYNDROM TYP III

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR MODULER LA PRESSION ARTERIELLE ET DIAGNOSTIQUER LE SYNDROME DE BARTTER TYPE III

Publication

EP 1019542 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950868 A

Priority

  • US 9820777 W
  • US 6021997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916909A1] Methods of identifying agonists or antagonists of the CLCNKB gene and the protein it encodes are disclosed. The invention also relates to the use of such agents to treat hypertension, conditions involving abnormal fluid volume and congestive heart failure and conditions related thereto. Also provided are compositions and methods for determining whether a patient is affected by or carries a mutation in the CLCNKB gene or the proteins they encode. The invention also relates to specific mutated nucleic acid sequences of the CLCNKB gene that give rise to Bartter's Syndrome Type III.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/12; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/18 (2013.01); C12N 15/63 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6883 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/172 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916909A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916909 A1 19990408; AU 9679998 A 19990423; CA 2305714 A1 19990408; EP 1019542 A1 20000719; JP 2001518312 A 20011016

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030208

2002-10-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHODS TO DIAGNOSE BARTTER'S SYNDROME TYPE III

2002-08-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHODS TO DIAGNOSE BARTTER'S SYNDROME TYPE III

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE