Global Patent Index - EP 1019593 A1

EP 1019593 A1 2000-07-19 - KIT FOR BUILDING A FALSE ROOF OF A SLOPING ROOF

Title (en)

KIT FOR BUILDING A FALSE ROOF OF A SLOPING ROOF

Title (de)

BAUSATZ FÜR EINE DACHUNTERKONSTRUKTION EINES GENEIGTEN DACHES

Title (fr)

JEU DE PIECES DETACHEES POUR LA CONSTRUCTION DU SOUS-TOIT D'UNE TOITURE INCLINEE

Publication

EP 1019593 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97949958 A

Priority

  • DE 9702745 W
  • DE 19743685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19743685C1] The frame (10) for making a self supporting roof (12) for an angled roof supports panels (38) extending towards the gutter. The frame has a forked section (14,16) and at least one cross beam in the area of the gutter (34,36) to support the panels. The forked sections match the form of the final roof assembly. The cross beams are free mounted and connected at their ends with the forked frames (14,16), so that the total load of the roof is transmitted to the building over the forked sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/02; E04B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/02 (2006.01); E04B 7/06 (2006.01); E04B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/026 (2013.01); E04B 7/02 (2013.01); E04B 7/063 (2013.01); E04B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918300A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FI FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19743685 C1 19990211; AU 5308898 A 19990427; AU 5547998 A 19990427; BR 9714921 A 20011127; BR 9715025 A 20011211; CN 1099511 C 20030122; CN 1099512 C 20030122; CN 1276034 A 20001206; CN 1276035 A 20001206; DK 1019593 T3 20030217; DK 1019594 T3 20020527; EP 1019593 A1 20000719; EP 1019593 B1 20021023; EP 1019594 A1 20000719; EP 1019594 B1 20020213; NO 20001712 A 20000531; NO 20001712 D0 20000403; NO 20001713 A 20000531; NO 20001713 D0 20000403; NO 320098 B1 20051024; WO 9918299 A1 19990415; WO 9918300 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-08-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-07-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031124

2004-07-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LAFARGE ROOFING EUROPE G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030224

2003-02-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030114

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-17 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59708584

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-28

2002-11-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB NL SE

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011018

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB NL SE