Global Patent Index - EP 1019594 A1

EP 1019594 A1 2000-07-19 - KIT FOR BUILDING A SELF-SUPPORTING FALSE ROOF OF A SLOPING ROOF

Title (en)

KIT FOR BUILDING A SELF-SUPPORTING FALSE ROOF OF A SLOPING ROOF

Title (de)

BAUSATZ FÜR EINE SELBSTTRAGENDE DACHUNTERKONSTRUKTION EINES GENEIGTEN DACHES

Title (fr)

JEU DE PIECES DETACHEES POUR SOUS-TOIT AUTOPORTEUR DE TOITURE INCLINEE

Publication

EP 1019594 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951804 A

Priority

  • DE 9702742 W
  • DE 19743685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19743685C1] The frame (10) for making a self supporting roof (12) for an angled roof supports panels (38) extending towards the gutter. The frame has a forked section (14,16) and at least one cross beam in the area of the gutter (34,36) to support the panels. The forked sections match the form of the final roof assembly. The cross beams are free mounted and connected at their ends with the forked frames (14,16), so that the total load of the roof is transmitted to the building over the forked sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/02; E04B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/02 (2006.01); E04B 7/06 (2006.01); E04B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/026 (2013.01); E04B 7/02 (2013.01); E04B 7/063 (2013.01); E04B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918299A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FI FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19743685 C1 19990211; AU 5308898 A 19990427; AU 5547998 A 19990427; BR 9714921 A 20011127; BR 9715025 A 20011211; CN 1099511 C 20030122; CN 1099512 C 20030122; CN 1276034 A 20001206; CN 1276035 A 20001206; DK 1019593 T3 20030217; DK 1019594 T3 20020527; EP 1019593 A1 20000719; EP 1019593 B1 20021023; EP 1019594 A1 20000719; EP 1019594 B1 20020213; NO 20001712 A 20000531; NO 20001712 D0 20000403; NO 20001713 A 20000531; NO 20001713 D0 20000403; NO 320098 B1 20051024; WO 9918299 A1 19990415; WO 9918300 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071125

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071124

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LAFARGE ROOFING EUROPE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING EUROPE GMBH

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING EUROPE GMBH

2002-05-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020429

2002-03-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LAFARGE ROOFING EUROPE GMBH

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706417 20020321

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB NL SE