Global Patent Index - EP 1019600 A1

EP 1019600 A1 2000-07-19 - FILTERING AND PUMPING ASSEMBLY FOR SWIMMING POOL WITH OVERFLOW

Title (en)

FILTERING AND PUMPING ASSEMBLY FOR SWIMMING POOL WITH OVERFLOW

Title (de)

FILTER- UND PUMPENVORRICHTUNG FÜR ÜBERLAUF-SCHWIMMBÄDER

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE FILTRATION ET DE POMPAGE POUR BASSIN DE PISCINE A DEVERSEMENT

Publication

EP 1019600 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98944019 A

Priority

  • FR 9802002 W
  • FR 9712576 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769334A1] The self-contained receiver (1) is connected to a panel (2) in one wall of the swimming pool which acts as a spillway. The receiver is more or less the same length as the panel and has a section to collect and store water from the pool. It is linked to a casing (4) containing a pump and filter which returns the water to the pool after treatment. The receiver is in two separate sections, an upper section (1a) connected to the spillway panel, and a lower (1b) which acts as a buffer tank, with a filter (3) between the two sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/12; E04H 4/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/12 (2006.01); E04H 4/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/14 (2013.01); E04H 4/1209 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918307A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769334 A1 19990409; FR 2769334 B1 19991203; AU 9170398 A 19990427; DE 69810794 D1 20030220; EP 1019600 A1 20000719; EP 1019600 B1 20030115; ES 2191331 T3 20030901; WO 9918307 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-11-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BONNET CLAUDE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FASANDIER BONNET LUCIENNE

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-01-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191331 T3

2003-07-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-04-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810794 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020111

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT