Global Patent Index - EP 1019624 A1

EP 1019624 A1 2000-07-19 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRO MECHANICAL REGULATING DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRO MECHANICAL REGULATING DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN STELLGERÄTS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE ELECTROMECANIQUE

Publication

EP 1019624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951261 A

Priority

  • DE 9802585 W
  • DE 19742989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917009A1] The regulating device comprises a regulating member and an actuator. The actuator has at least one electromagnet with a coil and a movable retaining plate. A first capture value (I_F1) is preset as a set value of the current by means of a first or a second coil (113, 115). A second capture value (I_F2) is preset as a set value when a first condition is met. A holding value (I_H) is preset as a set value when a second condition is met.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; F01L 9/04; F02D 35/00; H01F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01); H02K 33/02 (2006.01); H02P 25/06 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1844 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F02D 35/0007 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 13/0253 (2013.01); F02D 2041/001 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2017 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2034 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2037 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2079 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917009A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917009 A1 19990408; EP 1019624 A1 20000719; EP 1019624 B1 20020403; JP 2001518591 A 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050902

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050902

2004-11-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040921

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040907

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803659 20020508

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB