Global Patent Index - EP 1019625 A1

EP 1019625 A1 2000-07-19 - METHOD FOR MONITORING AN INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MONITORING AN INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERWACHEN EINES EINSPRITZSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN SYSTEME D'INJECTION

Publication

EP 1019625 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958164 A

Priority

  • DE 9802841 W
  • DE 19742991 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917010A1] A structure-borne signal from an internal combustion engine is used to calculate energy conversion during a combustion process according to a theoretical model and to derive the supplied amount of fuel therefrom. If the calculated amount of fuel deviates from the specified amount of fuel, a malfunction of the injection system is detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22; F02D 41/14; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/38 (2013.01); F02D 41/403 (2013.01); F02D 2200/025 (2013.01); F02D 2250/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917010A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917010 A1 19990408; EP 1019625 A1 20000719; EP 1019625 B1 20010718; US 6390068 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801054

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090923

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090923

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-07-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801054

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-23

2001-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB