Global Patent Index - EP 1019627 A1

EP 1019627 A1 2000-07-19 - JET PUMP COMPRISING A JET WITH VARIABLE CROSS-SECTION

Title (en)

JET PUMP COMPRISING A JET WITH VARIABLE CROSS-SECTION

Title (de)

SAUGSTRAHLPUMPE MIT EINER DÜSE MIT VARIABELEM DURCHSCHNITT

Title (fr)

POMPE A JET COMPRENANT UN GICLEUR DE SECTION VARIABLE

Publication

EP 1019627 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98946524 A

Priority

  • FR 9802083 W
  • FR 9712206 A
  • FR 9806524 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2769054A1] The invention concerns a jet pump, in particular for transferring fuel into a motor vehicle fuel tank, characterised in that it comprises a main jet (20), and a core (30) mounted mobile opposite the main jet (20) nozzle and downstream thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/02; F04F 5/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/02 (2006.01); F02M 37/18 (2006.01); F04F 5/48 (2006.01); F04F 5/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04F 5/52 (2013.01); F02M 37/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917013A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2769054 A1 19990402; FR 2769054 B1 20011207; AR 015461 A1 20010502; BR 9812571 A 20000725; DE 69814654 D1 20030618; DE 69814654 T2 20040408; EP 1019627 A1 20000719; EP 1019627 B1 20030514; JP 2001518594 A 20011016; US 6364625 B1 20020402; WO 9917013 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-11-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814654 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-05-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT