Global Patent Index - EP 1019630 A1

EP 1019630 A1 2000-07-19 - STARTING DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

STARTING DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

ANDREHVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DEMARRAGE POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1019630 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906032 A

Priority

  • DE 9900021 W
  • DE 19810954 A
  • DE 19851741 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947808A1] The invention relates to a starting device for internal combustion engines, comprising a starter motor having a pinion which initially engages the toothed ring of the internal combustion engine with a starting signal through an engaging magnet, before the starter motor triggers with full power the starting process. The aim of the invention is to improve engagement of the starter pinion and switching of the starter motor. For this purpose, the starter motor (SM) first drives the starter pinion with a reduced torque by means of the starting signal (st) through a series resistor (Rvor), and the engaging magnet (EM) engages the pinion with the toothed ring of the internal combustion motor. The engaging magnet (EM) then depresses fully the pinion in the toothed ring of the internal combustion engine, and the starter motor (SM) starts the internal combustion engine with full torque through by-passing the series resistor (Rvor).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/06 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/087 (2013.01); F02N 11/0851 (2013.01); F02N 2011/0874 (2013.01); F02N 2200/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947808A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947808 A1 19990923; EP 1019630 A1 20000719; EP 1019630 B1 20040421; JP 2001525037 A 20011204; JP 4108140 B2 20080625; KR 20010012120 A 20010215; US 6308674 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909233

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909233

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130207

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909233 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE