Global patent index - EP 1019633 A1

EP 1019633 A1 2000-07-19 - SCREW-TYPE COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

SCREW-TYPE COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

SCHRAUBENVERDICHTER

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR A VIS

Publication

EP 1019633 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955416 A

Priority

  • DE 19744466 A
  • EP 9806389 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19744466A1] The auxiliary rotor (16) is supported axially against the driven rotor (14). Only the driven rotor has a rotating bearing face (22) supported axially by a fixed bearing surface (66) of the casing (12). The axial bearing (15) formed by the adjacent faces (22, 66), is a plain bearing. The auxiliary rotor axial support comes exclusively from the interengaging threads (21, 25) of the rotors (20, 26). An hydraulic axial clamping unit (80) preloads the auxiliary rotor towards the outlet side, acting on its shaft (24) or screw. The axial bearing acts against the screw of the driven rotor. This bearing is formed by the rotor axial end wall, running against an annular bearing surface of the casing. These parts together form the plain bearing. The end bearing surface of the driven rotor is formed by a large bearing washer (22). The rotor end wall or washer have radial grooves for lubricant supply. These grooves can have various shapes, e.g. spiral or T-shaped. Part of the end surface of the auxiliary rotor is supported by the bearing washer of the driven rotor. The bearing washer may be cast, screwed or otherwise fixed to the shaft or screw of the driven rotor. A radial bearing surface is applied to the shafts of the rotors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/16 (2006.01); F01C 21/02 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/02 (2013.01); F04C 29/0021 (2013.01); F04C 2240/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918355A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19744466 A1 19990422; DE 19744466 C2 19990819; AT 231220 T 20030215; AU 1226599 A 19990427; AU 743902 B2 20020207; CN 1274410 A 20001122; EP 1019633 A1 20000719; EP 1019633 B1 20030115; ES 2191976 T3 20030916; JP 2001519503 A 20011023; RU 2212564 C2 20030920; US 6312239 B1 20011106; WO 9918355 A1 19990415

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KIRSTEN TECHNOLOGIE-ENTWICKLUNG G.M.B.H. *KT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20051031

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051010

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051008

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-10-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051009

2005-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051008

2005-01-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041229

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041201

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191976

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 1019633E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-05-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-04-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806955

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-02-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030115

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE