Global Patent Index - EP 1019661 A1

EP 1019661 A1 2000-07-19 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING SNOW

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREPARING SNOW

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON SCHNEE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE DE LA NEIGE

Publication

EP 1019661 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943107 A

Priority

  • NL 9800524 W
  • NL 1007187 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917067A1] The invention relates to a method for preparing snow, in particular in a hall intended for winter sports, comprising the steps of: bringing the hall to a temperature below freezing point; supplying a liquid for freezing to the hall and atomizing the liquid in the hall using a gas, wherein for atomizing purposes gas is supplied under a pressure of a maximum of 12 barg and a volume ratio between the gas and the liquid lies between 125 and 2000 Nm<3>/m<3>. The average size of the atomized liquid particles can herein amount to a maximum of 75 mu m (SMD). The hall can be divided into compartments for preparing the snow, wherein snow can then be prepared in one compartment at a time. The invention further relates to an apparatus for performing this method. In order to atomize the liquid for freezing this apparatus can be provided with one or more optionally movable spray nozzles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 3/04 (2013.01); F25C 2303/0481 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917067A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917067 A1 19990408; AU 9097398 A 19990423; DE 69829395 D1 20050421; DE 69829395 T2 20051006; EP 1019661 A1 20000719; EP 1019661 B1 20050316; NL 1007187 C2 19990407

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070910

2008-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SKIDOME NICKY BROOS C.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-05-04 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: DE GRAAF, JAN, DOUWE

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69829395

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020923

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKIDOME NICKY BROOS C.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SKIDOME NICKY BROOS C.V.

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB