Global Patent Index - EP 1019693 A1

EP 1019693 A1 2000-07-19 - TEMPLATE FOR DESIGNING HUMAN SEATING ACCOMODATIONS

Title (en)

TEMPLATE FOR DESIGNING HUMAN SEATING ACCOMODATIONS

Title (de)

SCHABLONE ZUM ENTWURF VON PERSONENSITZEN

Title (fr)

GABARIT DE DESSIN DE SIEGES POUR PERSONNES

Publication

EP 1019693 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940883 A

Priority

  • US 9816846 W
  • US 94921397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919708A1] A design template (10) includes a torso section (22) being one of a group of 95th percentile male, 50th percentile male and 5th percentile female having each being one of a group of an ERECT posture, a NEUTRAL posture and a SLUMPED posture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01M 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01M 99/00 (2011.01); A47C 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 31/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919708 A1 19990422; AU 8906198 A 19990503; DE 69830913 D1 20050825; DE 69830913 T2 20060420; EP 1019693 A1 20000719; EP 1019693 A4 20010207; EP 1019693 B1 20050720

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69830913

- Effective date: 20110301

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090903

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69830913 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REYNOLDS, HERBERT, M.

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERR, ROBERT

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRODEUR, RAYMOND

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RAYES, KHALDOUN

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NEAL, DOUGLAS

2000-11-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CUI, YUNTAO

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000501

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE