Global patent index - EP 1019802 A2

EP 1019802 A2 2000-07-19 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PAIN MANAGEMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LA GESTION DE LA DOULEUR

Publication

EP 1019802 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98949559 A

Priority

  • US 9820239 W
  • US 94006497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916407A2] A system and method for facilitating chronic pain management. A methodology is employed which includes determining the type of disease or chronic pain a patient is suffering from. A determination is made as to what treatments the patient has already undergone in treating the disease and/or chronic pain and what treatments the patient still needs. Based on the above determinations, the present invention formulates a treatment plan for the disease and/or chronic pain and employs historical data to forecast the likely outcome of the treatment plan, the length of the treatment, the associated costs and risks along with the log-term costs, patient function and the effectiveness of long-term therapy and the ongoing supportive needs of the patient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 7/00; G06F 7/04; G06F 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61G 12/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); G06F 19/00 (2011.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/3443 (2013.01); G06F 19/322 (2013.01); G06F 19/3481 (2013.01); G06F 19/328 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916407 A2 19990408; WO 9916407 A3 19990722; AU 9585798 A 19990423; EP 1019802 A2 20000719; EP 1019802 A4 20020206; JP 2003526125 A 20030902

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030276

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-02-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 7/00 A, 7G 06F 7/04 B, 7G 06F 7/20 B, 7G 06F 19/00 B

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000428;LT PAYMENT 20000428;LV PAYMENT 20000428;MK PAYMENT 20000428;RO PAYMENT 20000428;SI PAYMENT 20000428