Global Patent Index - EP 1019875 A1

EP 1019875 A1 2000-07-19 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KEEPING WATCH OVER PREMISES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KEEPING WATCH OVER PREMISES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERWACHEN VON RÄUMEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MISE EN SURVEILLANCE DE LOCAUX

Publication

EP 1019875 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98914940 A

Priority

  • FR 9800541 W
  • FR 9703362 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2761181A1] The invention concerns a system (1) for keeping watch over premises (10), comprising: means (LA-LD) for controlling access to these premises (10); means (V1-V3, P1-P8) for detecting intrusion or unauthorised presence in these premises (10), including perimeter detection means (P1-P8) for detecting any intrusion in a predetermined perimeter around these premises (10), volumetric detection means (V1-V3) for detecting any presence in predetermined zones of these premises (10). The access controlling means (LA-LE) and the intrusion detecting means (V1-V3, P1-P8) co-operate to put off the activation of some volumetric detection means (v1-V3) for a predetermined exception delay whenever said access controlling means (LA-LE) validate, during watch time, the presence of an authorised person or an access request from same. The invention is applicable to the watch and security of small buildings and professional and administrative offices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00; G08B 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G08B 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/008 (2013.01); G07C 9/00103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9841954A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2761181 A1 19980925; FR 2761181 B1 19990611; AU 6924898 A 19981012; CA 2283701 A1 19980924; CA 2283701 C 20061212; DE 69804120 D1 20020411; DE 69804120 T2 20020905; EP 1019875 A1 20000719; EP 1019875 B1 20020306; ES 2172884 T3 20021001; US 6111502 A 20000829; WO 9841954 A1 19980318

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-03-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030327

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172884 T3

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804120 20020411

2002-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI