Global Patent Index - EP 1019890 A1

EP 1019890 A1 2000-07-19 - METHOD FOR MOUNTING TILTING ELEMENT DISPLAYS BEHIND GLASS PANELS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MOUNTING TILTING ELEMENT DISPLAYS BEHIND GLASS PANELS

Title (de)

MONTAGE VON KIPPSEGMENTANZEIGEN HINTER SCHEIBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MONTAGE D'ELEMENTS INDICATEURS A SEGMENTS BASCULANTS DERRIERE DES VITRES

Publication

EP 1019890 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955352 A

Priority

  • DE 9802884 W
  • DE 19743130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9917267A1] The invention relates to a method for mounting a display module (16) behind a glass panel (1), especially a glass panel of a vehicle. The display module (16) comprises a plurality of display elements, each having a tilting segment and a light source allocated to said tilting element. In order to simplify assembly and to facilitate servicing, the invention provides that the display module is fixed by fixing elements (3) which can be glued on the inner side (2) of the glass panel (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 7/18; G09F 9/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2006.01); G09F 9/37 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/375 (2013.01); G09F 7/18 (2013.01); G09F 2013/0472 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917267A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9917267 A1 19990408; AT 211289 T 20020115; AU 1223799 A 19990423; CA 2305632 A1 19990408; DE 19881424 D2 20010118; EP 1019890 A1 20000719; EP 1019890 B1 20011219; HK 1030080 A1 20020906

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRANSIT-MEDIA GMBH SYSTEMTECHNIK FUER FAHRGASTINF

- Free text: TRANSIT-MEDIA GMBH SYSTEMTECHNIK FUER FAHRGASTINFORMATION#NOBELSTRASSE 22#76275 ETTLINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- TRANSIT-MEDIA GMBH SYSTEMTECHNIK FUER FAHRGASTINFORMATION#NOBELSTRASSE 22#76275 ETTLINGEN (DE)

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRANSIT-MEDIA G.M.B.H. SYSTEMTECHNIK FUR FAHRGAST

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-03-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802569 20020131

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211289 T 20020115

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010309

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE